Gortler, Judith Rena (CPSO#: 72229)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Clinic unit 2A
8000 Bathurst Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 0B8
Phone: (905) 709-9709
Fax: (905) 709-9701
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eric Marmor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 12 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gortler ( CPSO# 72229 )
Dr. E. Marmor ( CPSO# 62298 )

Business Address:
Suite 303
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 270-1104

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUDITH RENA GORTLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GORTLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000