Goss, Paul Edward (CPSO#: 56365)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Massachusetts General Hospital
L R H - 302
Lawrence House
55 Fruit Street
Boston MA  02114
United States
Phone: (617) 724-3118
Fax: (617) 643-2683

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 08 Sep 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL EDWARD GOSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOSS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1986