Gosse, Gordon David (CPSO#: 20849)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Dec 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 1975

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4 Pine Street
Belleville ON  K8N 2L8
Phone: (613) 962-0707
Fax: (613) 962-0425
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 02 Dec 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GORDON DAVID GOSSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOSSE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1975