Gosse, Gregory Craig (CPSO#: 52824)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
207-967 Bedford Hwy
Bedford NS  B4A 1A9
Phone: (902) 452-8357
Fax: (902) 835-1512

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 12 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY CRAIG GOSSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOSSE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1985