Gosselin, Benoit Joseph Jean (CPSO#: 59589)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Section of Otolaryngology
Dartmouth Hitchcock Medical Center
One Medical Center Drive
Lebanon NH  03756-0001
United States
Phone: (603) 650-8123

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New Hampshire

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 04 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BENOIT JOSEPH JEAN GOSSELIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOSSELIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1989
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2009