Gottesman, Irving Stanley (CPSO#: 29217)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jun 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Suite 506
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 820-2311
Fax: (905) 820-4648
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gottesman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 03 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Gottesman ( CPSO# 29217 )

Business Address:
506 - 2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (905) 820-1211

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 05 Sep 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IRVING STANLEY GOTTESMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOTTESMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1977