Gottesman, Maureen Cara (CPSO#: 72228)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Revera Westside Long Term Care Home
1145 Albion Road
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4J7
Phone: (416) 745-4800
Fax: (416) 745-0445
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Carefree Lodge (LTC)
306 Finch Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2N4S5
Canada
Phone: 4163971500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Kipling Acres (LTC)
2233 Kipling Avenue
Rexdale ON  M9W4L3
Canada
Phone: 4163922344
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hawthorne Place LTC
2045 Finch Ave W
Toronto ON  M3N 1M9
Canada
Phone: (416) 745-0811
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Humber Valley Terrace (Revera) LTC
95 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 5B5
Canada
Phone: (416) 746-7466
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Leisureworld Caregiving Centre
Etobicoke (LTC)
70 Humberline Dr
Etobicoke ON  M9W 7H3
Canada
Phone: (416) 213-7300
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

North York Family Physicians
After Hours Clinic
2901 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M2K 2Y6
Canada
Phone: (416) 491-6338
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Cheltenham (Leisureworld) LTC
5935 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M2R 1Y8
Canada
Phone: (416) 223-4050
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Cummer Lodge, Long Term Care Home
205 Cummer Ave
Toronto ON  M2M 2E8
Canada
Phone: 416-392-9525
Fax: 416-397-9779
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAUREEN CARA GOTTESMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOTTESMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2000