Gottesman, Steven Phillip (CPSO#: 56767)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
491 Lawrence Avenue West
Suite 100
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Phone: (416) 787-0117
Fax: (416) 787-8094
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hotz Sidlofsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Pankowski ( CPSO# 84291 )
Dr. R. Sidlofsky ( CPSO# 76781 )
Dr. S. Nusinowitz ( CPSO# 30834 )
Dr. D. Nahon ( CPSO# 81227 )
Dr. A. Hotz ( CPSO# 67906 )
Dr. S. Gottesman ( CPSO# 56767 )
Dr. M. Gelkopf ( CPSO# 60783 )
Dr. P. Freedman ( CPSO# 23615 )
Dr. R. Feldman ( CPSO# 50541 )
Dr. S. Colla ( CPSO# 24624 )
Dr. S. Kraus ( CPSO# 104638)

Business Address:
Suite 101
491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Phone Number: (416) 787-2776


Corporation Name: Steven Gottesman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gottesman ( CPSO# 56767 )

Business Address:
101 - 491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Phone Number: (416) 787-0323

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN PHILLIP GOTTESMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOTTESMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1987