Gotz, Tamas (CPSO#: 100100)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Mount Sinai Fertility 7th Floor 250 Dundas Street West Toronto ON M5T 2Z5
Date Received: 24 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 07 May 2013 to 03 Jun 2013
Elective Trainee - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 21 Oct 2013 to 03 Nov 2013
Elective Trainee - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

The University of Western Ontario, 04 Nov 2013 to 17 Nov 2013
Elective Trainee - Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2017