Gough, Kevin Alban (CPSO#: 63646)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Suite 4-179
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5568
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gough Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Gough ( CPSO# 63646 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Suite 4-179
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5568

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 04 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN ALBAN GOUGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOUGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1992