Gouin, Katy (CPSO#: 86898)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Maternal Fetal Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009