Goulard, Ginette (CPSO#: 65511)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Nov 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521 Ext. 6511
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Jul 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GINETTE GOULARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOULARD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 1992