Gould, David Harding (CPSO#: 18756)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 28 Nov 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1963
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 2012

Concerns

Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: September 30, 2012
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. David Harding Gould to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: this is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms please contact the College’s Registration Department):

I, Dr. Gould:

(2) Acknowledge and agree that the College referred allegations of disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, and failure to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in my care and treatment of 20 patients to the Discipline Committee in a Notice of Hearing dated July 26, 2011 (the “Notice of Hearing”).
(3) Acknowledge and agree that, in exchange for an original copy of this Undertaking as executed by me, the College has agreed to withdraw the Notice of Hearing.
(4) Hereby resign from the College effective Sept 30, 2012 (the “Effective Date”).
(5) Hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for a licence to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after the Effective Date.
(6) Agree that in the event that the College should became aware that I have either applied or re-applied for a licence to practise medicine in any jurisdiction after the Effective Date, the College shall have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this undertaking and, if successful, shall have the right to proceed with the specified allegations set out in the Notice of Hearing,
(9) Undertake to the College that upon signing this Undertaking, I shall forward a request to the General Manager of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan (“OHIP”) that my billing number be deactivated for services rendered after the date I cease to practise.
(10) Acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc., if any, arising from the implementation of any of the terms of this Undertaking.
(12) Consent to the terms of this undertaking being entered on the register as information that is available to the public.