Gould, John Richard (CPSO#: 50769)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Sep 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
York Region Public Health
17250 Yonge Street
Newmarket, Ontario
Newmarket ON  L3Y 6Z1
Phone: (905) 830-4444 Ext. 76401
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective: 07 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Community Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN RICHARD GOULD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOULD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 2 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 3 - Medical Biochemistry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 4 - Medical Biochemistry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 4 - Medical Biochemistry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2013