Gould, Lisa Faith (CPSO#: 57338)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Sep 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Winnipeg Clinic
425 St Mary Ave
Winnipeg MB  R3C 0N2
Phone: (204) 957-3252
Fax: (204) 942-0677

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 14 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA FAITH GOULD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOULD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1987