Gould, Peter Vincent (CPSO#: 64938)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 27 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Neuropathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 2001