Goulet, David Jonathan (CPSO#: 86254)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Apr 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dingwall Medical Group
Box 3011
40 Goodall Street
Dryden ON  P8N 2Z6
Phone: (807) 223-6683
Fax: (807) 223-4733
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Goulet Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Goulet ( CPSO# 86254 )

Business Address:
Dingwall Medical Group
Box 3011
40 Goodall Street
Dryden ON  P8N 2Z6
Phone Number: (807) 223-6683

Business Address:
Dryden Regional Health Centre
58 Goodall Street
Dryden ON  P8N 2Z6
Phone Number: (807) 223-8200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID JONATHAN GOULET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOULET is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2010