Goulet, Kristian Bernard (CPSO#: 96561)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Sep 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1108 Klondike Road
Kanata ON  K2K 0G1
Phone: (613) 254-9777
Fax: (613) 254-9778
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1355 Bank St, Suite 111
Ottawa ON  K1H 8K7
Canada
Phone: 613-260-1477
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kristian Bernard Goulet Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 12 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Goulet ( CPSO# 96561 )

Business Address:
Active Care Clinic
1108 Klondike Road
Kanata ON  K2K 0G1
Phone Number: (613) 254-9777

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 13 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISTIAN BERNARD GOULET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOULET is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 17 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2013