Goulet, Marie-Helene (CPSO#: 90053)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Mar 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Mar 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CSSS de Gatineau
909 Boulevard de la Verendrye Ouest
Gatineau QC  J8P 7H2
Phone: (819) 966-6100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIE-HELENE GOULET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOULET is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2015