Gourlay, Douglas Louis (CPSO#: 57308)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 22 Sep 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
849 Upper Wentworth Street
Hamilton ON  L9A 5H4
Phone: (905) 387-6897
Fax: (906) 387-4899
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 05 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1987
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 22 Sep 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 22 Sep 2010 Active View Details [+]
            As  from  September 22, 2010, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation  on  the  certificate  of  registration  held  by  Dr. Douglas Louis
            Gourlay, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by  Dr. Gourlay to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  I  agree to restrict my practice of medicine by having no direct  contact
                  with  patients, that is, I shall not engage in any professional encounter
                  or interaction with any patient.