Govan, Jairaj Jivan (CPSO#: 64543)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 405
5 Fairview Mall Drive
North York ON  M2J 2Z1
Phone: (416) 499-6161
Fax: (416) 499-6301
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.J. Govan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Govan ( CPSO# 64543 )

Business Address:
405 - 5 Fairview Mall Drive
North York ON  M2J 2Z1
Phone Number: (416) 499-6161

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 24 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAIRAJ JIVAN GOVAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOVAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1994