Govender, Preneshlin Vadival (CPSO#: 77390)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Natal, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 27 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2002 to 31 Mar 2003
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Mar 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2004