Govind, Mayur Harshadrai (CPSO#: 104614)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: Govind, Mayur H (used until: 23 May 2016 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Quarry Ridge Road
Suite 205
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: 705 728 1962
Fax: 705 728 9455
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Govind Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 26 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Govind ( CPSO# 104614)

Business Address:
205 - 1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 728-1962

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Jul 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAYUR HARSHADRAI GOVIND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOVIND is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 15 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 15 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2016