Gow, Barbara Louise (CPSO#: 50771)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 May 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302
170 Simcoe Street
Peterborough ON  K9H 2H7
Phone: (705) 741-1191
Fax: (705) 741-1192
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1985 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARBARA LOUISE GOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOW is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 1985