Gow, Rachel Sara (CPSO#: 106469)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: 905-525-9140 Ext. 22118
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kyle Dorosh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 10 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Dorosh ( CPSO# 100441)
Dr. R. Gow ( CPSO# 106469)

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
McMaster Clinic
Room 260
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL-3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 525-9140

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RACHEL SARA GOW shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. GOW is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. GOW shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. GOW is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. GOW shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. GOW is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. GOW no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018