Gowan, Russell Thomas (CPSO#: 66931)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Oct 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Oct 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 08 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 17 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 6 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Resident 8 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 8 - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Oct 2002