Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Gowda, Kempe Singri (CPSO#: 60210)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Aug 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Kannada

Education:Mysore Medical College, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Specialists Internal Medicine
207- 2nd Avenue North
Saskatoon SK  S7K 3P2
Phone: (306) 664-8833
Fax: (306) 653-3166

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 02 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEMPE SINGRI GOWDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOWDA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1988