Gowing, Robert Neil (CPSO#: 82610)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
50 Alliance Boulevard
Barrie ON  L4M 5K3
Phone: (705) 728-8778
Fax: (705) 728-3053
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gowing Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 10 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gowing ( CPSO# 82610 )

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5

Business Address:
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Phone Number: (705) 325-2201

Business Address:
50 Alliance Boulevard
Barrie ON  L4M 5K3
Phone Number: (705) 728-9482

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6S7
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 25 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT NEIL GOWING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOWING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010