Goyal, Kimmy (CPSO#: 94293)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 22 Aug 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Windsor University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 8
3068 Mayfield Road
Brampton ON  L6Z 0E3
Phone: (905) 495-4646
Fax: (905) 495-0056
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kimmy Goyal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 22 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Goyal ( CPSO# 94293 )

Business Address:
Unit 8
3068 Mayfield Road
Brampton ON  L6Z 0E3
Phone Number: (905) 495-4646

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Feb 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 21 Feb 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Kimmy Goyal may practice medicine independently in Family Medicine, only.