Goyal, Mayank (CPSO#: 72975)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:All-India Institute of Medical Sciences, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 16 Aug 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 01 Feb 2001
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Feb 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jan 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jul 2006