Grabner, Claudia Johanna (CPSO#: 77463)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Dec 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 752-7871
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Claudia Grabner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Grabner ( CPSO# 77463 )

Business Address:
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 752-7871

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLAUDIA JOHANNA GRABNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRABNER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2004