Grace, Brian William (CPSO#: 42273)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 29 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Public Service Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 1983
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2002