Grace, David Michael (CPSO#: 19614)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jul 1965

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1965

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medpoint Healthcare Centre
233-355 Wellington Street
London ON  N6A 3N7
Phone: (519) 432-1919
Fax: (519) 432-2566
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 16 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID MICHAEL GRACE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRACE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1965
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 12 Aug 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1970