Graczyk, Joanna (CPSO#: 88803)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Mar 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
PO Box 9056
835 King St W
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: 519 749 4370
Fax: 519 749 4378
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Graczyk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Graczyk ( CPSO# 88803 )

Business Address:
Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
PO Box 9056
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4370

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 18 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOANNA GRACZYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRACZYK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2013