Grad, Sharon Elizabeth (CPSO#: 66728)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences Corp.
Regional Rehabilitation Centre
300 Wellington Street North
Hamilton ON  L8L 0A4
Phone: (905) 527-0271 Ext. 40819
Fax: (905) 577-8233
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sharon Grad Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Grad ( CPSO# 66728 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences Corp.
Regional Rehabilitation Centre
300 Wellington Street North
Hamilton ON  L8L 0A4
Phone Number: (905) 527-0271

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre,Regional Rehabilitation Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHARON ELIZABETH GRAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1997