Grad, Willis Brian (CPSO#: 63397)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Sep 1994

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 20 Sep 1991 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Mar 1991 to 07 Apr 1991
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Sep 1994