Grafham, Mark Ronald George (CPSO#: 62178)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Mar 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
505 King Street West
Hamilton ON  L8P 1B9
Phone: (905) 525-3501
Fax: (905) 528-5468
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Grafham Hart Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Hart ( CPSO# 65000 )
Dr. M. Grafham ( CPSO# 62178 )

Business Address:
King West Medical Associates
505 King Street West
Hamilton ON  L8P 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 525-3501


Corporation Name: Mark Grafham Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Grafham ( CPSO# 62178 )

Business Address:
505 King Street West
Hamilton ON  L8P 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 525-3501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK RONALD GEORGE GRAFHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAFHAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 1992