Graham, Andrew James (CPSO#: 58252)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 06 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 2000