Graham, Anthony Francis (CPSO#: 21892)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 May 1973

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 May 1973

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Room 7 056 Queen Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5602
Fax: (416) 864-6072
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 906
2300 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 1E4
Canada
Phone: (647) 776-2500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony F. Graham Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Graham ( CPSO# 21892 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
7-056
Queen Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5602

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 21 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY FRANCIS GRAHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAHAM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Aug 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 1973