Graham, Christopher Scott (CPSO#: 67172)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
224 King St. East
Brockville ON  K6V 1C6
Phone: (613) 342-5332
Fax: (613) 498-2424
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER SCOTT GRAHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAHAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998