Graham, Duncan Claire Macrae (CPSO#: 54291)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
21 McGivern Street
Box 1300
Walkerton ON  N0G 2V0
Phone: (519) 881-2880
Fax: (519) 370-2425
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Duncan Graham Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 21 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Graham ( CPSO# 54291 )

Business Address:
Box 1300
21 McGivern Street
Walkerton ON  N0G 2V0
Phone Number: (519) 881-2880

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site Walkerton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DUNCAN CLAIRE MACRAE GRAHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAHAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1989