Graham, Gail Elizabeth (CPSO#: 65446)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Nov 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Nov 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern
Ontario
Department of Genetics
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2620
Fax: (613) 738-4220
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Genetics Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GAIL ELIZABETH GRAHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAHAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Medical Genetics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Medical Genetics

University of Ottawa, 03 Feb 1997 to 07 Mar 1997
Elective Trainee - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Sep 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2000