Graham, Ian Davidson (CPSO#: 22645)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Apr 1970

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 13 Nov 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
206 St. Clair Avenue West
Suite 2
Toronto ON  M4V 1R2
Phone: (416) 920-5546
Fax: (416) 920-5151
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

208 St. Mary's River Drive
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 5V4
Canada
Phone: 1 855 213 0582
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Dec 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 1970
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2006
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 16 Apr 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 17 Jan 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from January 17, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ian Davidson Graham,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Graham to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking") 
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. IAN DAVIDSON GRAHAM
                                          ("Dr. Graham") 
                  
                                                to
                  
                        THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  

            A.    PREAMBLE


            (1)   I, Dr. Graham, certificate of registration number 22645, am a member of
                  the College. The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice arising out of a reassessment of my practice pursuant to a
                  Discipline Order dated April 16, 2009 and ICRC decision dated September
                  12, 2011.

            (2)   I, Dr. Graham, acknowledge that I am subject to a Discipline Committee
                  Order dated April 16, 2009 which imposes terms, conditions and
                  limitations on my certificate of registration, none of which are altered
                  by this Undertaking.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (3)   I, Dr. Graham, understand to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective upon the date this Undertaking is approved by the ICR Committee
                  ("Effective Date").

            (4)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Graham, undertake that effective immediately:
                  
                        (i)   I shall restrict my practice to psychotherapy only;
                  
                        (ii)  I shall not prescribe any medication to any person or make
                              any recommendations with regards to medication treatment. For
                              further clarity, I acknowledge that I shall not prescribe or
                              recommend any drug or substance for any purpose;
                  
                        (iii) In the event that a patient requires pharmacotherapy, I will
                              refer the patient back to his or her family physician or
                              another qualified physician without making any recommendation
                              in regards to medication treatment. When referring a patient
                              according to this provision, I shall provide the receiving
                              physician with a letter which includes the wording contained
                              in the form attached as Appendix "A".

                        (iv)  Upon receiving a referral of a patient for psychotherapy, I
                              shall send a letter which includes the wording contained in
                              the form attached at Appendix "B" to the referring physician
                              regarding the above restrictions on my practice.
                  
            (5)   Posting a Sign

                  (a)   I, Dr. Graham, undertake to the College that, effective
                        immediately, I shall post a sign in the waiting room(s) of all of
                        my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in
                        the form set out at Appendix "C". For further clarity, this sign
                        shall state as follows:
                  
                        "Dr. Graham engages in psychotherapy only. He cannot prescribe any
                        medication, or make any recommendations in regards to medication
                        treatment. In the event that medication is needed, Dr. Graham will
                        refer patients to another qualified physician who will assume the
                        care of the patient in regards to medication initiation and
                        management. Further information may be found on the College of
                        Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Graham, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of
                        this Undertaking, to provide services in any language(s) other than
                        English, I will notify the College prior to providing any such
                        services and shall ensure that a translated sign approved by the
                        College is posted in accordance with this section.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Graham, undertake to provide to the College the certified
                        translation(s) described in subparagraph B(5)(b) prior to beginning
                        to provide services in the language(s) described in subparagraph
                        B(5)(b).
                  
            (6)   Clinical Supervision

                  (b)   I, Dr. Graham, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        Clinical Supervisor, who is acceptable to the College (the
                        "Supervisor"), for a period of twelve (12) months.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Graham, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Supervisor(s)'s
                        undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "D", and understand what
                        is required of the Supervisor(s), including, at minimum:
                  
                        (i)   Facilitating the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Appendix
                              "E";
                  
                        (ii)  During the initial period of Clinical Supervision, meet with
                              me and review at least ten (10) of my patient charts once
                              every other week. After a minimum of three (3) months, upon
                              the recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor(s) and subject
                              to College approval, the Clinical Supervision will step down
                              to   low

                              level supervision during which the Clinical Supervisor(s)
                              will meet with me and review at least ten (10) of my patient
                              charts once every month for the remaining nine (9) months;
                  
                        (iii) Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (iv)  Making recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development; and
                  
                        (v)   Submitting written reports to the College at least once every
                              month, or more frequently if the Supervisor(s) has concerns
                              about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Graham, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Supervisor(s) based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP set out at Appendix "E" to my Undertaking, as
                        well as the areas of concern identified in the report(s) of the
                        Medical Inspector, dated March 7, March 14, and November 2, 2016,
                        and concerns that may arise during the period of supervision.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Graham, undertake to co-operate fully with the supervision
                        of my practice, conducted under this term of the Undertaking and
                        Appendix "D" attached, and to abide by the recommendations of my
                        Supervisor(s), including but not limited to, any recommended
                        practice improvements and ongoing professional development.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Graham, undertake to ensure that Appendix "D" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date the ICR Committee approves this Undertaking.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Graham, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "D" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its terms, I shall, within twenty
                        (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Graham, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Supervisor(s)
                        on the terms set out under subparagraphs B(6)(f) and/or (g) above,
                        I will cease practising medicine until such time as I have obtained
                        a Supervisor(s) acceptable to the College.
                  
                  (i)   I, Dr. Graham, agree that if I am required to cease practice as a
                        result of subparagraph B(6)(h) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my Certificate of Registration and said
                        term, condition and limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (7)   Professional Education

                  (a)   I, Dr. Graham, undertake to, under the guidance of my
                        Supervisor(s), participate in and successfully complete the
                        following professional education:


                        (i)   all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix
                              "E"; and
                  
                        (ii)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Graham, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the professional education set out above
                        in subparagraph B(7)(a) as soon as possible.
                  
            (8)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Graham, undertake that, approximately three (3) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in B(6) above
                        and Appendix "D" attached, I will submit to a Reassessment of my
                        practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected
                        by the College (the "Assessor(s)").
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Graham, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under this term of the Undertaking, and to abide by those
                        recommendations of the Assessor(s) that are approved by the
                        Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Graham, acknowledge and agree that my Supervisor(s) may
                        receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may discuss
                        with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment. I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Graham, understand and agree that if I am of the view that
                        any of the Assessor(s)' recommendations are unreasonable, I will
                        have 30 days following my receipt of the recommendations within
                        which to provide the College with my submissions in this regard. I
                        further understand and agree that thereafter, the Inquiries,
                        Complaints and Reports Committee ("ICR Committee") will consider my
                        submissions and make a determination regarding whether or not the
                        recommendations, or any of them, are reasonable and if so, whether
                        they, or any of them, constitute limitations or restrictions on my
                        practice, and that decision will be provided to me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Graham, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
                        subparagraph B(8)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations
                        of the Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are
                        reasonable.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Graham, hereby consent to the inclusion, on the public
                        register as a term, condition or limitation on my Certificate of
                        Registration, for the purposes of Section 23 of the Health
                        Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated
                        Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended, of any
                        of those recommendations of the Assessor(s) which are limitations
                        and restrictions on my practice and/or which the ICR Committee has
                        identified in its decision referenced in subparagraph B(8)(d) as
                        limitations and restrictions on my practice.
                  
            (9)   Monitoring

                  (d)   I, Dr. Graham, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise including, but not limited to,
                        hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within 15 days of
                        executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to
                        inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within 15
                        days of commencing practice at that location.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Graham, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the terms of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Graham, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan
                        ("OHIP"), the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotic Monitoring
                        System ("NMS") implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness
                        Act, 2010 and/or any person or institution who may have relevant
                        information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with
                        the terms of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Graham, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "F" and "G"
                        respectively, and that the consent forms(s) are part of this
                        Undertaking.
                  
            (10)  I, Dr. Graham, undertake to comply with the terms and conditions of this
                  Undertaking and acknowledge that a breach by me of any term of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (11)  I, Dr. Graham, acknowledge that all appendices and schedules attached to
                  or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (12)  I, Dr. Graham, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
                  of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the terms of this Undertaking.

            (13)  I, Dr. Graham, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand
                  the terms and conditions provided in this Undertaking and that I have
                  obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this
                  Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

            (14)  I, Dr. Graham, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes
                  terms, conditions and limitations on my certificate of registration for
                  the purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this
                  Undertaking shall be information on the College's Register that is
                  available to the public during the time period that the Undertaking
                  remains in effect.

            (15)  I, Dr. Graham, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

            The College received information about Dr. Graham's standard of practice. As a
            result:

            *     Dr. Graham will engage in psychotherapy only;
            *     Dr. Graham will not prescribe any medication to any person or make any
                  recommendations as to medication treatment;
            *     Dr. Graham shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting room(s) of
                  all his Practice Locations, which states as follows: "Dr. Graham engages
                  in psychotherapy only. He cannot prescribe any medication, or make any
                  recommendations in regards to medication treatment. In the event that
                  medication is needed, Dr. Graham will refer patients to another qualified
                  physician who will assume the care of the patient in regards to
                  medication initiation and management. Further information may be found on
                  the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at
                  www.cpso.on.ca."
            *     Dr. Graham will practice under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor
                  acceptable to the College for twelve (12) months;
            *     Dr. Graham's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the
                  College within three (3) months of the end of the period of Clinical
                  Supervision.

            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Graham, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities approved by the College, at any hospital or Practice
                  Location where I practice or have privileges ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and
                  to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has
                  that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or
                  any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Graham, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the professional education set
                  out in B(7) above, and to all Clinical Supervisors and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Graham, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates
                  my completion of the professional education set out in subparagraph B(7)
                  above, and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chief(s) of Staff and Assessors,
                  to disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the terms of the Supervisor's undertaking set out at
                        Appendix "B";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        education set out at subparagraph B(7) above and which he or she
                        reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my
                        patients.
                  
                  
            As from 12:00 p.m., April 16, 2009, by order of the Discipline Committee of the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms, conditions
            and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ian
            Davidson Graham:   

                  (a)   Dr. Graham shall not prescribe narcotics or controlled drugs and
                        substances as defined in Schedules I to IV of the Controlled Drugs
                        and Substances Act, including but not limited to all narcotic
                        drugs, narcotic preparations, controlled drugs, benzodiazepines and
                        other targeted substances; 
                  
                  (b)   Dr. Graham shall not accept for treatment any patients with bipolar
                        disorders. If any patients commence treatment and are subsequently
                        identified as suffering from a bipolar disorder he shall attempt to
                        transfer their care to another physician and will cease treating
                        the patient within 30 days;  
                  
                  (c)   At his own expense, Dr. Graham shall undergo a comprehensive
                        practice assessment (the "CPA"), to be completed within eight
                        months of the date of this order, by an assessor qualified to
                        assess his practice selected by the College, and shall abide by any
                        and all recommendations made as result of  the CPA. This CPA will
                        be conducted at Dr. Graham's sole expense;
                  
                  (d)   Dr. Graham shall practice only under the supervision of a clinical
                        supervisor approved by the College who has signed an undertaking
                        and who has reviewed the College's expert report dated December 24,
                        2007. This clinical supervisor will be at Dr. Graham's expense and
                        will report regularly to the College or immediately if the clinical
                        supervisor has concerns regarding patient safety or regarding Dr.
                        Graham's compliance with the terms of this order. The supervision
                        will continue until Dr. Graham receives notice from the College
                        that the report of the CPA has been received and considered by the
                        College; and
                  
                  (e)   Dr. Graham shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced
                        inspections of his practice(s) and patient charts by College
                        representatives, and other College activities conducted for the
                        purposes of assessing his compliance with these terms, conditions
                        and limitations on his certificate of registration. All such
                        inspections shall be at Dr. Graham's sole expense.
                  
            As from February 28, 2007, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ian Davidson Graham,
            in accordance with an undertaking provided by Dr. Graham to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

            Dr. Graham undertakes that effective immediately,  

                  (a)   he will not prescribe or issue new prescriptions for any substances
                        listed in the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, Schedules I, II,
                        III and IV (except for Meprobarnate, Benzodiazepines, Zolpidem and
                        Pemoline); and 
                  
                  (b)   he will not sign new medical declarations or renew existing medical
                        declarations under the Marihuana Medical Access Regulations.
                  
                  
                  
                  
                  
                  
                  
                  

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 16 Apr 2009
Summary:

On April 16, 2009, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Graham committed an act of 
professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. 
 
1.    The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to impose immediately the following 
      terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Graham s Certificate of Registration: 
 
      (a)   Dr. Graham shall not prescribe narcotics or controlled drugs and substances as 
            defined in Schedules I to IV of the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, 
            including but not limited to all narcotic drugs, narcotic preparations, controlled 
            drugs, benzodiazepines and other targeted substances;  
 
      (b)   Dr. Graham shall not accept for treatment any patients with bipolar disorders. If 
            any patients commence treatment and are subsequently identified as suffering 
            from a bipolar disorder he shall attempt to transfer their care to another physician 
            and will cease treating the patient within 30 days;    
 
      (c)   At his own expense, Dr. Graham shall undergo a comprehensive practice 
            assessment (the CPA ), to be completed within eight months of the date of this 
            order, by an assessor qualified to assess his practice selected by the College, and 
            shall abide by any and all recommendations made as result of  the CPA. This 
            CPA will be conducted at Dr. Graham s sole expense; 
 
      (d)   Dr. Graham shall practice only under the supervision of a clinical supervisor 
            approved by the College who has signed an undertaking and who has reviewed the 
            College s expert report dated December 24, 2007. This clinical supervisor will be 
            at Dr. Graham s expense and will report regularly to the College or immediately if 
            the clinical supervisor has concerns regarding patient safety or regarding Dr. 
            Graham s compliance with the terms of this order. The supervision will continue 
            until Dr. Graham receives notice from the College that the report of the CPA has 
            been received and considered by the College; and 
 
      (e)   Dr. Graham shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of 
            his practice(s) and patient charts by College representatives, and other College 
            activities conducted for the purposes of assessing his compliance with these terms, 
            conditions and limitations on his certificate of registration. All such inspections 
            shall be at Dr. Graham s sole expense. 
 
2.    The Discipline Committee Orders Dr. Graham to pay to the College costs in the amount 
      of $3,650.00, within 30 days of the date of this Order. 
 
3.    The Discipline Committee directs the results of this proceeding to be included in the 
      register. 
 
  
 
               
              
              

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): April 16, 2009

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: January 17, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Ian Davidson Graham to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 17, 2017:

The College received information about Dr. Graham’s standard of practice. As a result:

• Dr. Graham will engage in psychotherapy only;
• Dr. Graham will not prescribe any medication to any person or make any recommendations as to medication treatment;
• Dr. Graham shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting room(s) of all his Practice Locations, which states as follows: “Dr. Graham engages in psychotherapy only. He cannot prescribe any medication, or make any recommendations in regards to medication treatment. In the event that medication is needed, Dr. Graham will refer patients to another qualified physician who will assume the care of the patient in regards to medication initiation and management. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca.”
• Dr. Graham will practice under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for twelve (12) months;
• Dr. Graham’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within three (3) months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: January 17, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)