Graham, John Douglas (CPSO#: 65076)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queen Square Doctors
Suite 201
366 Main Street North
Brampton ON  L6V 1P8
Phone: (905) 455-1455
Fax: (905) 455-5498
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John D. Graham Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Graham ( CPSO# 65076 )

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7

Business Address:
Queen Square Doctors
Suite 201
366 Main Street North
Brampton ON  L6V 1P8
Phone Number: (905) 455-5477

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 27 Nov 2001 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN DOUGLAS GRAHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAHAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Rotating Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993