Graham, John Joseph (CPSO#: 83715)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 11 Sep 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Division of Cardiology
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5918
Fax: (416) 864-5914
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Heart Centre
2300 Yonge Street
Suite 906
Toronto ON  M4P 1E4
Canada
Phone: (647) 776-2500
Fax: (647) 260-0279
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.J. Graham Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 13 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Graham ( CPSO# 83715 )

Business Address:
Toronto Heart Centre
Suite 906
2300 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 1E4
Phone Number: (647) 776-2500

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Cardiology
Queen 6-038
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5918

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 11 Sep 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2005 to 22 Nov 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 23 Nov 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Nov 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 10 Sep 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 27 Nov 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 27 Nov 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. John Joseph Graham may practise medicine independently in cardiology, only.