Graham, John Wallace (CPSO#: 21009)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1983 to 30 Jun 1983
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015