Graham, Karen Louise (CPSO#: 60024)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: McComber, Karen Louise (used until: 21 Jun 1991 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Emergency Department
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 4515
Fax: (613) 548-6042
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karen Graham Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Graham ( CPSO# 60024 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 546-1240

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 09 Dec 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN LOUISE GRAHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAHAM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1988