Graham, Lawrie Jean (CPSO#: 60778)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3075 Ridgeway Drive
Unit 43
Mississauga ON  L5L 5M6
Phone: (905) 828-6061
Fax: (905) 820-9468
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAWRIE JEAN GRAHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAHAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1990