Graham, Melissa Ann (CPSO#: 88398)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
Suite 105
2300 Eglinton Avenue
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 813-3850
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELISSA ANN GRAHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAHAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2013