Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Graham, Natasha (CPSO#: 55987)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 May 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, French, Russian

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
37 Dixon Avenue
Toronto ON  M4L 1N4
Phone: (416) 410-7167
Fax: (416) 698-7621
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1 Rainsford Road, Unit 504
Toronto ON  M4L 3N5
Canada
Phone: 416-410-7167
Fax: 416-698-7621
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Natasha Graham Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Graham ( CPSO# 55987 )

Business Address:
37 Dixon Avenue
Toronto ON  M4L 1N4
Phone Number: (416) 410-7167

Business Address:
504 - 1 Rainsford Avenue
Toronto ON  M4L 3N5
Phone Number: (416) 410-7167

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATASHA GRAHAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAHAM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 1987